VA SJR175 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ175ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ175ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending W. Taylor Reveley III.
Title
Commending W. Taylor Reveley III.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ175ER) |
2018-03-02 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-02-28 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2018-02-28 | House | Received |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Presented 18101894D |