VA SJR166 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ166ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ166ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Clarence M. Dunnaville, Jr.
Title
Commending Clarence M. Dunnaville, Jr.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] |
Sen. Glen Sturtevant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ166ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-03-02 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2018-03-02 | House | Received |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Presented 18101599D |