VA SJR16 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ16ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ16ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Acknowledging with profound regret the unethical use of Black bodies by medical institutions. Expresses the sentiment of the General Assembly in acknowledging with profound regret the unethical use of Black bodies by medical institutions in the Commonwealth.
Title
Unethical use of Black bodies by medical institutions; acknowledging with profound regret.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] |
Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] | Sen. Stella Pekarsky [D] | Sen. Russet Perry [D] | Sen. Saddam Salim [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ16ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Taken up |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103131D |