VA SJR157 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ157ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ157ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments of certain persons. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor McAuliffe after January 7, 2016, and communicated to the General Assembly on January 26, 2016.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ157ER) |
2016-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-03-08 | House | Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-03-08 | House | Taken up |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16104829D |