VA SJR15 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ15ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ15ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Education to study teacher licensing process; report. Requests the Department of Education to study the teacher licensure process and the assessment requirements therein for any inherent biases that may prevent minority teacher candidates from entering the profession.
Title
Teacher licensing process; Department of Education to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (90-Y 2-N) (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ15ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (90-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Agreed to by House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (90-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-04 | House | Taken up |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20101660D-E |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ15E |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101660D |