VA SJR15 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-29 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ15ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-29 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ15ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Paul E. Torgersen.
Title
Celebrating the life of Paul E. Torgersen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ15ER) |
2016-01-29 | House | Agreed to by House |
2016-01-15 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2016-01-15 | House | Received |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2015-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/13/16 16100053D |