VA SJR148 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending David Bailey Associates.
Title
Commending David Bailey Associates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Left in Rules |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Presented 16104922D |