VA SJR133 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ133ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ133ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointment; Confirming Governor's appointment; February 2. Confirms the appointment of an agency head made by Governor Ralph Northam and communicated to the General Assembly February 2,
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ133ER) |
2018-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | Agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | Taken up |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18106688D |