VA SJR111 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ111ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Bernard J. Caton.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Bernard J. Caton.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ111ER)
2018-02-16HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2018-02-09HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2018-02-09HouseReceived
2018-02-08SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2018-02-08SenateEngrossed by Senate
2018-02-02SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2018-02-02SenatePresented 18100606D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback