VA SJR106 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ106ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ106ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Ebenezer Baptist Church.
Title
Commending Ebenezer Baptist Church.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ106ER) |
2016-02-05 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-25 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2016-01-25 | House | Received |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 16102213D |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Presented 16102213D |