VA SJR105 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ105ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ105ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending B. Wayne Coleman.
Title
Commending B. Wayne Coleman.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Kiggans [R] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Thomas Norment [R] |
Sen. Mark Obenshain [R] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ105ER) |
2022-02-21 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-02-18 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2022-02-18 | House | Received |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Presented 22103497D |