VA SB996 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Capitol Police; concurrent jurisdiction. Provides that a Capitol Police officer who is a detector canine handler has concurrent jurisdiction with the law-enforcement officers of another jurisdiction that has requested the assistance of the Capitol Police in the detection of firearms, ammunition, explosives, propellants, or incendiaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capitol Police; concurrent jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB996ER)
2020-03-05SenateEnrolled
2020-02-28SenateTitle replaced 20108582D-H1
2020-02-28SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (34-Y 3-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB996H1
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108582D-H1
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-24HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108582D-H1
2020-02-19HouseReported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateReported from Rules (12-Y 2-N)
2020-01-16SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-16SenatePresented and ordered printed 20104520D

Same As/Similar To

HB1626 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB996&201+sum+SB996
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB996+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB996H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB996ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S10V0084+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0996+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0528SB0996+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0576SB0996+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H20V0158+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1526+SB0996
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1248SB0996+SB0996

Bill Comments

feedback