VA SB996 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Temporary detention orders; duration. Increases the maximum duration that a person may be detained pursuant to a temporary detention order from 48 to 72 hours. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2014, and is contingent upon an appropriation of general funds effectuating the provisions of this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary detention orders; increases maximum duration person may be detained from 48 to 72 hours.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-18HouseLeft in Appropriations
2013-02-12HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2013-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2013-02-12HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 4-N)
2013-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2013-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2013-02-06HouseAssigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
2013-02-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2013-02-06HouseRead first time
2013-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2013-02-01SenateBills placed in block (39-Y 0-N)
2013-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 13101573D-E
2013-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB996E
2013-01-31SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2013-01-31SenateReading of amendment waived
2013-01-31SenateRead second time
2013-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-01-29SenateReported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2013-01-16SenateRereferred to Finance
2013-01-16SenateReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2013-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2013-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101573D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192169.6(n/a)See Bill Text
192182.9(n/a)See Bill Text
372809(n/a)See Bill Text
372814(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback