VA SB995 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of outdoor advertising in sight of public highways; exceptions. Provides that signs that are related to public safety, provide directional information, or provide public information may be situated or installed in highway rights-of-way. The bill provides that any signs other than those related to public safety, providing directional information, or providing public information may not be situated or installed in highway rights-of-way.
Title
Outdoor advertising; regulation, signs in sight of public highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 6-N) (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794) | |
2018-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 794 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB995ER) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 6-N) |
2018-03-09 | House | Passed House (89-Y 6-N) |
2018-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported from Transportation (19-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18107185D-E |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB995E |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Emergency clause deleted |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 18107185D |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced at the request of Governor |