VA SB994 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1047)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1047)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Military Institute. Provides that Virginia Military Institute (the Institute) shall be grounded in a strict code of honor and high academics, shall uphold a strict military structure, and shall remain solely an undergraduate degree-granting institution of higher education. All cadets shall participate in one of the Reserve Officers' Training Corps (ROTC) programs at all times while attending the Institute. The Institute shall continue to demonstrate its commitment to contributing to the elimination of sexual violence in the military and shall develop reasonable policies and procedures to demonstrate such continued commitment. The bill provides that the Adjutant General, who is a member of the board of visitors (the board), shall serve as an ex officio nonvoting member. Current law states that the Adjutant General shall serve ex officio. The bill removes the requirement that the board get the prior written consent of the Governor in order to exercise its powers regarding gifts, grants, devises, and bequests. The bill states that the board shall prescribe the terms upon which all cadets, and not just pay cadets, may be admitted, their number, the course of their instruction, and the nature and duration of their service. The bill provides that the Institute, rather than the board, may admit annually as state cadets, upon evidence of fair moral character, individuals selected from the Commonwealth at large who are at least 16 but not more than 25 years old. The bill replaces the current provision allowing the Institute to admit military scholarship cadets to allow the Institute to admit Virginia National Guard scholarship cadets and removes the annual cap of 40 such scholarships. The bill expands who can confer degrees to include the superintendent and removes the authority of the board to confer honorary degrees or diplomas of distinguished merit.
Title
VMI; the Institute shall be grounded in a strict code of honor and academic excellence, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 4-N) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1047) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1047 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB994ER) |
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 4-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 4-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 20109961D-S2 |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Helmer, Carroll Foy, Collins |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Norment, Reeves, Stuart |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House insisted on amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House with amendment (93-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-03 | House | Amendment by Delegate Helmer agreed to |
2020-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB994S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107377D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107377D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105408D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 2500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |