VA SB994 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Restitution; probation. Establishes procedures to be used by courts to monitor the payment of restitution by defendants. The bill requires that a probation agency ordered to monitor the restitution payments of a defendant placed on supervised probation notify the court and the attorney for the Commonwealth of the amount of unsatisfied restitution (i) 60 days prior to the defendant's release from supervision or (ii) if the agency requests that the defendant be released from supervision, at the time the agency submits its request for the defendant's release. The bill requires that the court conduct a hearing prior to the defendant's release from supervision to review the defendant's compliance with the restitution order. The bill also requires that in the case of a defendant who was not placed on supervised probation, the court must schedule a hearing within two years of the date of the restitution order or release from incarceration to review the defendant's compliance with the restitution order. The bill requires that the court continue to conduct hearings to monitor a defendant's compliance with the restitution order for a period of 10 years from the date of the first review hearing or the period of probation, whichever is longer. The bill provides that a court may discontinue hearings to review a defendant's compliance with the restitution order if the court determines that the defendant is unable to pay and will remain unable to pay restitution for the duration of the review period. The bill also sets forth the remedies available to the court, including contempt, in the case of a defendant who fails to comply with a restitution order. This bill is identical to HB 484.
Title
Restitution; probation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 671 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB994ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House (80-Y 17-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18107023D |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced at the request of Governor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 358 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 368.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 176.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |