VA SB993 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0222)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0222)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Land Conservation Board of Trustees; membership. Expands from 19 to 20 members the total membership of the Virginia Land Conservation Board of Trustees by adding an additional nonlegislative citizen member and stipulates that the 12 nonlegislative citizen members shall include one person from each of the 11 congressional districts and one member of a state-recognized or federally recognized Virginia Indian Tribe. Current law stipulates that the 11 nonlegislative citizen members shall include one person from each congressional district, at least one of whom shall be a member of a state-recognized or federally recognized Virginia Indian Tribe.
Title
Virginia Land Conservation Board of Trustees; expands membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0222) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 222 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB993ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102253D |