VA SB991 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Office of Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance; Broadband Advisory Council; expiration. Extends the expiration of the Office of Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance and the Broadband Advisory Council from July 1, 2018, to July 1, 2019. This bill is identical to HB 999.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance, Office of, and Broadband Advisory Council; expiration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
2018-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 760 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB991ER)
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled
2018-03-10HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10SenateConference substitute printed 18108307D-S2
2018-03-10 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-08SenateSenators: McDougle, Reeves, Edwards
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Byron, Ransone, Sullivan
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08SenateSenate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HouseHouse requested conference committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2018-03-08SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
2018-03-08HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB991H1
2018-03-08HouseRead third time
2018-03-07HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107902D-H1
2018-03-07HouseRead third time
2018-03-06HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107902D-H1
2018-03-01HouseReported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB991S1
2018-02-13SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107118D-S1
2018-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-13SenateRead second time
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107118D-S1
2018-02-12SenateReported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-09SenateReported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-24SenatePresented and ordered printed 18105271D
2018-01-24SenateUnanimous consent to introduce

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222699.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB991
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB991+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB991S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB991H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB991S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB991ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0760+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S10V0037+SB0991
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0230+SB0991
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0494SB0991+SB0991
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0495SB0991+SB0991
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0496SB0991+SB0991
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H20V0218+SB0991
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1467+SB0991
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1107SB0991+SB0991
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1119SB0991+SB0991
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1221SB0991+SB0991
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1576+SB0991

Bill Comments

feedback