VA SB990 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Tourism Authority; Governor's New Airline Service Incentive Fund. Creates the Governor's New Airline Service Incentive Fund to be administered by the Virginia Tourism Authority to support the local, regional, national, and international airports in Virginia by providing the means for attracting new passenger air service routes by advertising and promoting new air service routes that would commence in Virginia. The bill provides that expenditures must be consistent with the commercial air service plan adopted by the Virginia Aviation Board. The bill requires that a grant from the Fund shall not be awarded if it can be reasonably anticipated to result in the reduction of existing commercial air service at another airport located within the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governor's New Airline Service Incentive Fund; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (82-Y 12-N) (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) (Y: 1 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB990ER)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (82-Y 12-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (82-Y 12-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05SenateConference substitute printed 20109756D-S2
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-04HouseDelegates: Austin, Bulova, Plum
2020-03-04HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-03SenateSenators: Edwards, Newman, Ebbin
2020-03-03SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-03SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-03-02HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-28SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with substitute (86-Y 12-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB990H1
2020-02-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108583D-H1
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108583D-H1
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB990S1
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107493D-S1
2020-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-06SenateRead second time
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107493D-S1
2020-02-04SenateIncorporates SB984 (Newman)
2020-02-04SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105451D

Same As/Similar To

SB984 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
HB1602 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222320.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB990&201+sum+SB990
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB990+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB990S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB990H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB990S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB990ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0153+SB0990
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0357SB0990+SB0990
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0373SB0990+SB0990
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0374SB0990+SB0990
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0049+SB0990
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0399+SB0990
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1480+SB0990
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1247SB0990+SB0990
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1432SB0990+SB0990
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1787SB0990+SB0990
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2092+SB0990

Bill Comments

feedback