VA SB990 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; regulation of fertilizer. Revises the laws governing the manufacture and application of fertilizer to: (i) incorporate by reference the guidelines adopted by the Association of American Plant Food Control Officials, (ii) adopt generic precautionary labeling guidelines to prevent fertilizer runoff into the waterways, (iii) shift the permit year to begin on April 1 instead of July 1, (iv) require distributors of commercial fertilizer to submit an annual statistical report to the Commissioner regarding the amounts and localities of distributed product, (v) allow the Commissioner to issue written notices or warnings in lieu of instituting formal proceedings, (vi) authorize the Board to impose a civil penalty of up to $250 on anyone who violates a written stop sale, and (vii) allow the imposition of late fees for failing to renew a registration, license, or permit and for failing to obtain a registration, license, or permit after receiving notice of this requirement.
Title
Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; regulation of fertilizer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 552 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB990ER) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Title replaced 11105203D-H1 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB990H1 | |
2011-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105203D-H1 | |
2011-02-11 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105203D-H1 | |
2011-02-09 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11102216D-E | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB990E | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Assigned ACNR sub: Fertilizer | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102216D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2057 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 3600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3602.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3611 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3615 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3619 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3621 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3623 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3624 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3625 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |