VA SB989 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Antitrust Act; exemption for hospitals. Removes the exemption from the Virginia Antitrust Act that currently exists for certain activities of nonprofit hospitals or their officers, directors, or employees.
Title
Virginia Antitrust Act; exemption for hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 574 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB989ER) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed House (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105773D |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |