VA SB983 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB983
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; definition of "medical care facility." Adds to the list of medical care facilities for which a certificate of public need is required any facility located in Planning District 20 that has common ownership with an affiliated licensed hospital located within 35 miles of the facility and that includes, as part of the facility, a dedicated emergency department as defined in 42 C.F.R. § 489.24(b) that is subject to the requirements of the federal Emergency Medical Treatment and Active Labor Act. Certificate of public need; definition of "medical care facility." Adds to the list of medical care facilities for which a certificate of public need is required any facility located in Planning District 20 that has common ownership with an affiliated licensed hospital located within 35 miles of the facility and that includes, as part of the facility, a dedicated emergency department as defined in 42 C.F.R. § 489.24(b) that is subject to the requirements of the federal Emergency Medical Treatment and Active Labor Act.
Title
Certificate of public need; definition of "medical care facility," facilities subject to review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-25 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105569D-E |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB983E |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Certificate of Public Need |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105569D |
Same As/Similar To
SB983 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote