VA SB982 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Graduation requirements; local alternative paths to standard units of credit. Requires the Board of Education, in establishing course and credit requirements for a high school diploma, to permit local school divisions to waive the requirement for students to receive 140 clock hours of instruction to earn a standard unit of credit upon providing the Board with satisfactory proof, based on Board guidelines, that the students for whom such requirements are waived have learned the content and skills included in the relevant Standards of Learning.
Title
Graduation requirements; local alternative paths to standard units of credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 702 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB982ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title replaced 15105199D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute (94-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB982H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105199D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105199D-H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB982S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104504D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104504D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2015-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101034D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1675 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)