VA SB976 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1278)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Pharmacy; pharmaceutical processors; cannabis dispensing facilities. Defines "cannabis dispensing facilities" and allows the Board of Pharmacy to issue up to five permits for cannabis dispensing facilities per health service area. The bill requires the Board to establish a ratio of one pharmacist for every six pharmacy interns, technicians, and technician trainees for pharmaceutical processors and cannabis dispensing facilities. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to require that, after processing and before dispensing cannabis oil, a pharmaceutical processor make a sample available from each homogenized batch of product for testing at an independent laboratory located in Virginia that meets Board requirements. The bill requires that the Board promulgate regulations that include an allowance for the sale of devices for administration of dispensed products and an allowance for the use and distribution of inert product samples containing no cannabinoids for patient demonstration exclusively at the pharmaceutical processor or cannabis dispensing facility, and not for further distribution or sale, without the need for a written certification. The bill also requires the Board to adopt regulations for pharmaceutical processors that include requirements for (i) processes for safely and securely cultivating cannabis plants intended for producing cannabis oil; (ii) a maximum number of marijuana plants a pharmaceutical processor may possess at any one time; (iii) the secure disposal of plant remains; (iv) dosage limitations, which shall provide that each dispensed dose of cannabis oil not exceed 10 milligrams of tetrahydrocannabinol; and (v) a process for registering cannabis oil products. The bill requires the Board of Pharmacy to promulgate required regulations within 280 days of the bill's enactment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmaceutical processors; operation of cannabis dispensing facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (87-Y 5-N) (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1278)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1278 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB976ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (87-Y 5-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (87-Y 5-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB976ER)
2020-03-06SenateEnrolled
2020-03-02SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-02-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-28HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-28HouseRead third time
2020-02-27HouseRead second time
2020-02-25HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 1-N)
2020-02-18HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB976S1
2020-02-10SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107275D-S1
2020-02-10SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-10SenateRead second time
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107275D-S1
2020-02-06SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105207D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182250.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text
221277(n/a)See Bill Text
5412519(n/a)See Bill Text
5412521(n/a)See Bill Text
5412522.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412903(n/a)See Bill Text
5413320(n/a)See Bill Text
5413408.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB976&201+sum+SB976
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB976+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB976S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB976ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB976ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1278+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0161+SB0976
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0410SB0976+SB0976
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0450SB0976+SB0976
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0451SB0976+SB0976
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1202V0045+SB0976
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0396+SB0976
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0443+SB0976
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1648+SB0976
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1371SB0976+SB0976
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1954SB0976+SB0976
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2261+SB0976

Bill Comments

feedback