VA SB973 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Track and Trace Program. Establishes the Track and Trace Program for the monitoring of the movement of controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Track and Trace Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Education and Health
2018-02-08SenateContinued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18105623D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412527(n/a)See Bill Text
5412534(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback