VA SB970 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Official emblems and designations; state grape. Official emblems and designations; state grape. Designates the muscadine grape as the state grape.
Title
Muscadine grape; designating as state grape.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Left in Rules |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB970S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106398D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106398D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105710D |