VA SB97 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Occoquan. Establishes a new charter for the Town of Occoquan in Prince William County and repeals the current charter, which was created in 1930. The proposed charter sets out the organization of the town's government and contains powers typically granted to towns. Changes from the current charter include (i) updating the description of the Town's boundary, (ii) changing the election dates for councilmembers and the mayor from May to November, (iii) changing the mayor's and councilmembers' terms of office from two years to four years, (iv) eliminating provisions that duplicate provisions in the Code of Virginia, and (v) deleting outdated provisions.
Title
Occoquan, Town of; new charter, previous charter repealed except section 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 536 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB97ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100499D |
Same As/Similar To
HB822 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
HB822 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
HB822 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)