VA SB968 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0983)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0983)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Maintenance and repair of relocated billboard signs. Provides for the maintenance and repair of nonconforming billboard signs.
Title
Relocated billboard signs; maintenance and repair.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0983) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 983 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB968ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (75-Y 24-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (75-Y 24-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Transportation (17-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104219D-E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB968E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104219D |