VA SB968 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting license; bear, deer, or turkey; electronic carry. Removes the requirement that a license to hunt bear, deer, or turkey be carried in paper form, allowing it to be carried by electronic or computerized means.
Title
Hunting license; bear, deer, or turkey; electronic carry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 363 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB968ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101294D |