VA SB965 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities. Advances the date rate reviews are scheduled to resume for Dominion Energy Virginia (DEV) from 2022 to 2021. The review will use the three 12-month test periods beginning January 1, 2018, and ending December 31, 2020. The measure provides that for purposes of the Utility Facility Act a company that owns or operates facilities for the storage of electric energy for sale, including pumped hydroelectric generation and storage facilities in the coalfield region of Virginia, is a public utility. The measure excludes from the definition of "public utility," for purposes of the Utility Facility Act, a company that provides storage of electric energy that is not for sale to the public, if the company is not organized as a public utility. The measure also includes enactment clauses that (i) direct the State Corporation Commission to conduct pilot programs for the deployment of electric power storage batteries; (ii) bar Appalachian Power (AEP) from recovering $10 million of incurred fuel costs; (iii) direct DEV to provide current customers a one-time bill credit of $133 million; (iv) require DEV to roll into its base rates certain costs associated with the conversion of certain generation facilities to utilize biomass as fuel; (v) require reductions in the rates for all incumbent electric utilities to reflect reductions in federal tax liability resulting from the enactment of federal tax legislation; and (vi) require DEV and AEP to continue funding for pilot programs for energy assistance and weatherization for low-income, elderly, and disabled individuals.
Title
Electric utility regulation; rate review proceedings, Transitional Rate Period, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Electric Utility |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105571D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB965 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB965+hil |