VA SB963 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land preservation tax credit; per taxpayer limitation. Extends to taxable year 2017 the $20,000 limit on the amount that a taxpayer may claim per year under the land preservation tax credit. The bill retains the $50,000 limit for each subsequent taxable year.
Title
Land preservation tax credit; per taxpayer limitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 424 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB963ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House (86-y 12-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101770D |