VA SB961 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; processing of rejected absentee ballots. Provides that when an absentee ballot is rejected, at least two officers of election, one representing each political party, are required to write and sign a statement for the cause of the ballot's rejection. Currently, the law requires that a majority of the officers write and sign such statement.
Title
Absentee voting; processing of rejected absentee ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 276 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB961ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103090D |