VA SB957 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1045)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1045)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commission on Civic Education; sunset and funding; membership. Repeals the sunset provision for the Commission on Civic Education and repeals a prohibition on the use of general funds to support the work of the Commission. The bill also increases and adjusts the makeup of the Commission's membership.
Title
Civic Education, Commission on; sunset and funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1045) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1045 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB957ER) |
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Bulova, Lopez, Ware |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Marsden, McClellan, Newman |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB957H1 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108647D-H1 |
2020-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108647D-H1 |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104449D |