VA SB955 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Celebration of marriage; fee. Increases from $50 to $75 the maximum fee that may be charged by a person other than a minister who is authorized to celebrate the rites of marriage.
Title
Celebration of marriage; fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N 1-A) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 181 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020 | |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB955ER) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N 1-A) |
2020-02-19 | House | Passed House (57-Y 42-N 1-A) |
2020-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105259D |