VA SB952 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services; Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Commission; membership; sunset. Extends from July 1, 2023, to July 1, 2026, the expiration of the Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Commission and expands from 15 to 20 the membership of the Commssion by adding the Commissioner of the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services, the Commissioner of Health, the Director of the Department of Medical Assistance Services, the Commissioner of the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, and the Commissioner of the Department of Social Services, or their designees, as ex officio members with nonvoting privileges. Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services; Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Commission; membership; sunset. Extends from July 1, 2023, to July 1, 2026, the expiration of the Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Commission and expands from 15 to 20 the membership of the Commssion by adding the Commissioner of the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services, the Commissioner of Health, the Director of the Department of Medical Assistance Services, the Commissioner of the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, and the Commissioner of the Department of Social Services, or their designees, as ex officio members with nonvoting privileges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Commission; membership, sunset.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-17 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)
2023-03-17 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 45 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-23SenateSigned by President
2023-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB952ER)
2023-02-22SenateEnrolled
2023-02-17HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HouseRead third time
2023-02-16HouseRead second time
2023-02-14HouseReported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
2023-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2023-02-09HouseRead first time
2023-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2023-01-24SenatePrinted as engrossed 23102904D-E
2023-01-24SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB952E
2023-01-24SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2023-01-24SenateReading of amendments waived
2023-01-24SenateRead second time
2023-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-01-20SenateReported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2023-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2023-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102904D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515154(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB952
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB952+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB952E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB952ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0045+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23104986A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+SB952AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB952F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB952FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB952FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S10V0017+SB0952
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0084SB0952+SB0952
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0108SB0952+SB0952
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H20V0091+SB0952
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1931+SB0952

Bill Comments

feedback