VA SB951 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School service providers; student access to collected personal information. Requires school service providers to provide, either directly to the student or his parent or through the school, access to an electronic copy of such student's personal information in a manner consistent with the functionality of the school service. The bill permits contracts between local school boards and school service providers to require that such electronic copy be in a machine-readable format.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School service providers; student access to collected personal information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
2017-03-16 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 518 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB951ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-23SenateTitle replaced 17105484D-H1
2017-02-23SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB951H1
2017-02-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17105484D-H1
2017-02-22HouseRead third time
2017-02-21HouseRead second time
2017-02-20HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105484D-H1
2017-02-20HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2017-02-10HouseAssigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-02-08HouseRead first time
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-06SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB951S1
2017-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17104917D-S1
2017-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-06SenateRead second time
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 17104917D-S1
2017-01-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2016-12-31SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2016-12-31SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101629D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221289.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB951
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB951+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB951S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB951H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB951ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0518+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S04V0125+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0293SB0951+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0319SB0951+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0320SB0951+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0901V0072+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H09V0188+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2641+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0908SB0951+SB0951

Bill Comments 750

feedback