VA SB951 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Disposition of dead bodies. Clarifies the role of a person other than a decedent's next of kin, a person designated to make arrangements for the decedent's burial or the disposition of his remains, an agent named in an advance directive, or a court-appointed guardian to make decisions regarding the disposition of a decedent's remains. The bill defines "disposition" as the burial, interment, entombment, cremation, or other authorized disposition of a dead body. The bill also clarifies the definition of next of kin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dead bodies; disposition of remains or burial of decedent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
2015-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 670 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
2015-02-26SenateSigned by President
2015-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-25SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB951ER)
2015-02-25SenateEnrolled
2015-02-23SenateTitle replaced 15105158D-H1
2015-02-23SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2015-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB951H1
2015-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 15105158D-H1
2015-02-19HouseRead third time
2015-02-18HouseRead second time
2015-02-17HouseCommittee substitute printed 15105158D-H1
2015-02-17HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2015-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
2015-02-10HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2015-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2015-02-06HouseRead first time
2015-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-02SenateRead second time and engrossed
2015-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-01-29SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2015-01-19SenateRereferred to Education and Health
2015-01-19SenateRereferred from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N)
2015-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2015-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100228D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321309.1(n/a)See Bill Text
321309.2(n/a)See Bill Text
5412818.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+SB951
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB951+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB951H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB951ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0670+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S12V0014+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S04V0086+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0178SB0951+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0206SB0951+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H1203V0068+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H12V0130+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2501+SB0951
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0700SB0951+SB0951

Bill Comments 750

feedback