VA SB951 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Student and school employee conduct; bullying. Defines the term "bullying" and requires school boards to prohibit students and school employees from engaging in any act of bullying. The bill also requires local school boards to implement policies and procedures for reporting, investigating, and addressing acts of bullying by July 1, 2014. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bullying; defines term and requires school boards to prohibit acts by students and school employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-31SenateStricken at request of patron in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2013-01-17SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2013-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2013-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101895D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221208.01(n/a)See Bill Text
221276.01(n/a)See Bill Text
221279.6(n/a)See Bill Text
221291.4(n/a)See Bill Text
801220.1:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback