VA SB951 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Freedom of Information Act; transfer of records. Clarifies that the Library of Virginia is the custodian of records transferred to it for permanent archiving pursuant to the duties imposed by the Virginia Public Records Act (§42.1-76 et seq.) and for responding to requests for such records made under FOIA. This bill is a recommendation of the Freedom of Information Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freedom of Information Act; Library of Va. is custodian of records transferred to it for archiving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)
2011-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 604 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-03-06 Senate: Signed by President
2011-03-03 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-03-03 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB951ER)
2011-03-03 Senate: Enrolled
2011-02-22 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2011-02-22 House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2011-02-22 House: Read third time
2011-02-21 House: Read second time
2011-02-17 House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
2011-02-15 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2011-02-11 House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
2011-02-09 House: Referred to Committee on General Laws
2011-02-09 House: Read first time
2011-02-09 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-08 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 Senate: Read second time and engrossed
2011-02-04 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2011-02-02 Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2011-01-26 Senate: Assigned GL&T sub: FOIA/Conflict of Interest
2011-01-11 Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2011-01-11 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102392D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223704(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback