VA SB950 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonrepairable and rebuilt vehicles. Eliminates the requirement that nonrepairable and rebuilt vehicles have incurred damage that exceeds 90 percent of their cash value prior to such damage to meet the definition of nonrepairable and rebuilt vehicles. The bill requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to report to the Chairmen of the House and Senate Transportation Committees on the impact of the bill, if any, on the number of nonrepairable vehicle and salvage certificates issued over the three-year period after July 1, 2017, compared with the number of such certificates issued over the three-year period before July 1, 2017. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2021.
Title
Nonrepairable and rebuilt vehicles; eliminates certain requirement sunset provision, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 362 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB950ER) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed House with amendment (96-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17103017D-E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB950E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103017D |