VA SB949 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; uncompensated medical costs; victims of sexual assault. Adds to those persons invited to participate in the annual meeting of the group led by the attorney for the Commonwealth to coordinate the multidisciplinary response to criminal sexual assault in each political subdivision (i) local health department district directors; (ii) the administrator of each licensed hospital within the jurisdiction; (iii) the director of each health safety net clinic within the jurisdiction; and (iv) any other local health care providers, or their designees, and authorizes attorneys for the Commonwealth to conduct the sexual assault response team annual meetings using other methods, such as electronic communication means, to encourage attendance. The bill also eliminates the requirement that a victim of sexual assault report the assault to law enforcement or undergo a physical evidence recovery kit examination to be eligible for compensation for uncompensated medical costs through the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund, and directs the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to establish a work group to evaluate the feasibility of moving responsibility for the SAFE program from the Virginia Workers’ Compensation Commission to the Department of Medical Assistance Services and to provide recommendations related to increasing the reimbursement rates for sexual assault forensic examinations to cover the actual cost of such examinations and including reimbursement of costs associated with preparing for and participating in a criminal trial related to the sexual assault when a sexual assault forensic nurse is subpoenaed to participate in such trial as a cost that is reimbursable through the SAFE program. The workgroup shall report its findings and conclusions to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations, the Senate Committee on Finance, and the Joint Commission on Health Care by September 1, 2020. This legislation is approved by the Joint Commission on Health Care. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; uncompensated medical costs, victims of sexual assault.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20106731D-ES1
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB949ES1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106731D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-03SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106731D-S1
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-13SenatePresented and ordered printed 20104828D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521627.4(n/a)See Bill Text
192368.11:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback