VA SB949 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Southern Virginia Higher Education Center. Requires the Southern Virginia Higher Education Center (the Center) to encourage the development and delivery of workforce training in collaboration with educational institutions serving the region, with a focus on critical shortage areas and the needs of industry. The bill replaces the superintendent of the Halifax County Public Schools as an ex officio member of the board of trustees of the Center with a superintendent of a public school division located in the Southside region appointed by the Governor. The bill also broadens the eligibility requirements to serve as one of the representatives of business and industry on the board of trustees. The bill requires the board of trustees to seek opportunities to collaborate with local comprehensive community colleges to meet specialized noncredit workforce training needs identified by industry. However, if the local comprehensive community college is unable to meet such needs, then the board may seek to collaborate with other education providers or provide Center-delivered specialized noncredit workforce training. This bill is identical to HB 2172.
Title
Southern Virginia Higher Education Center; members of board of trustees, powers and duties.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305) | |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 305 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB949ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB949S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105150D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105150D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101153D |
Subjects
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Southside Virginia
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Southside Virginia
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 3120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |