VA SB946 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

State plan for medical assistance; doulas. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to amend the state plan for medical assistance services to include a provision for the payment of medical assistance for antepartum, intrapartum, and postpartum services provided to a pregnant person by a doula, including services for labor and delivery support and at least four visits during the antenatal period and seven visits during the postpartum period. The bill also directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to conduct a rate study to determine appropriate reimbursement rates for doula services provided to Medicaid recipients and to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistance services; state plan to include doulas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-30SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-13SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105398D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback