VA SB944 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Holding handheld personal communications devices while driving a motor vehicle. Prohibits any person from holding a handheld personal communications device while driving a motor vehicle. Current law prohibits (i) the reading of any email or text message and manually entering letters or text in such a device as a means of communicating and (ii) holding a personal communications device while driving in a work zone. The bill expands the exemptions to include handheld personal communications devices that are being held and used (a) as an amateur radio or a citizens band radio or (b) for official Department of Transportation or traffic incident management services. This bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.
Title
Handheld personal communications devices; holding devices while driving a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Transportation (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Incorporated by Transportation |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104384D |
Same As/Similar To
SB160 (Similar To) 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)