VA SB942 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0850)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State sales and use tax; Historic Triangle. Creates a one percent state sales and use tax in the Historic Triangle. Fifty percent of the revenues will be used to market, promote, and advertise the Historic Triangle as an overnight tourism destination and the other 50 percent will be distributed to the localities in which the revenues were collected. The revenues for tourism will be deposited into a fund to be administered by the Tourism Council of the Greater Williamsburg Chamber and Tourism Alliance (the Council), created by the bill. The Council will oversee an office of tourism and will report annually to the chief executive officer of each locality in the Historic Triangle and to the Chairmen of the House Committees on Finance and Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance. The bill defines the Historic Triangle as the City of Williamsburg and the Counties of James City and York, an area of historic significance that generates substantial employment and economic benefit for the Commonwealth. The bill is contingent on the City of Williamsburg repealing recent ordinances raising the local transient occupancy, food and beverage, and admission taxes and will expire if any of the localities in the Historic Triangle raise or reinstate such taxes in the next seven years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; creates a state sales tax and use tax in the Historic Triangle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 26-N) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (63-Y 34-N) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 10-N) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0850)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 850 (effective - see bill)
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled bill text (SB942ER2)
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 26-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (70-Y 26-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 11-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-01SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB942ER)
2018-03-01SenateEnrolled
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (63-Y 34-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House (63-Y 34-N)
2018-02-28HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House (65-Y 32-N)
2018-02-28HouseRead third time
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseTaken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-26HouseReported from Finance (12-Y 9-N)
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13SenatePassed Senate (27-Y 10-N)
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB942S1
2018-02-13SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106684D-S1
2018-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-13SenateRead second time
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106684D-S1
2018-02-08SenateReported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18101134D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813819(n/a)See Bill Text
5813823(n/a)See Bill Text
581603.2(n/a)See Bill Text
581638(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB942
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB942+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB942S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB942ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB942ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0850+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0221+SB0942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0410SB0942+SB0942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0486SB0942+SB0942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0493SB0942+SB0942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0136+SB0942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1092+SB0942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1107+SB0942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1121+SB0942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1244SB0942+SB0942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1682+SB0942

Bill Comments

feedback