VA SB941 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1143)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1143)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local government meetings; weather. Authorizes any political subdivision, board of zoning appeals, or local government board, commission, or authority, by resolution adopted at a regular meeting, to fix the day or days to which a regular meeting shall be continued if the chairman, or vice-chairman if the chairman is unable to act, finds and declares that weather or other conditions are such that it is hazardous for members to attend the regular meeting. The bill requires that such findings be communicated to the members and the press as promptly as possible and that all hearings and other matters previously advertised be conducted at the continued meeting, and no further advertising is required.
Title
Local government meetings; weather.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1143) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1143 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB941ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Title replaced 20108744D-H1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB941H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108744D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108744D-H1 |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104543D |