VA SB938 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lights on other vehicles; animal-drawn vehicles. Clarifies that the existing requirements for vehicles to display white lights in the front and red lights in the rear or approved reflectors applies to animal-drawn vehicles. The bill also provides that such lights may be battery-operated. Lights on other vehicles; animal-drawn vehicles. Clarifies that the existing requirements for vehicles to display white lights in the front and red lights in the rear or approved reflectors applies to animal-drawn vehicles. The bill also provides that such lights may be battery-operated.
Title
Animal-drawn vehicles; lights on other vehicles, reflectors.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 324 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB938ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Title replaced 23106958D-H1 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB938H1 |
2023-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23106958D-H1 |
2023-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106958D-H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 Department of Motor Vehicles |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102557D |