VA SB935 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; eligibility for in-state tuition. Provides that any student is eligible for in-state tuition who (i) attended high school for at least two years in the Commonwealth and either (a) graduated on or after July 1, 2008, from a public or private high school or program of home instruction in the Commonwealth or (b) passed, on or after July 1, 2008, a high school equivalency examination approved by the Secretary of Education; (ii) has submitted evidence that he or, in the case of a dependent student, at least one parent, guardian, or person standing in loco parentis has filed, unless exempted by state law, Virginia income tax returns for at least two years prior to the date of registration or enrollment; and (iii) registers as an entering student or is enrolled in a public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth. The bill states that students who meet these criteria shall be eligible for in-state tuition regardless of their citizenship or immigration status, except students with currently valid visas issued under 8 U.S.C. § 1101(a)(15)(F), 1101(a)(15)(H)(iii), 1101(a)(15)(J) (including only students or trainees), or 1101(a)(15)(M). Information obtained in the implementation of the provisions of the bill shall only be used or disclosed to individuals other than the student for purposes of determining in-state tuition eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; eligibility for in-state tuition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767)
2020-04-07 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 767 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB935ER)
2020-02-27SenateEnrolled
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House (56-Y 44-N)
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-17HouseReported from Education (14-Y 8-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB935S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106793D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N)
2020-01-30SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106793D-S1
2020-01-30SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
2020-01-21SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2020-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-10SenatePresented and ordered printed 20104686D

Same As/Similar To

HB1547 (Same As) 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231506.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB935&201+sum+SB935
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB935+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB935S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB935ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0767+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0102+SB0935
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0257+SB0935
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0935+SB0935
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0528SB0935+SB0935
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0568SB0935+SB0935
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0218+SB0935
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0374+SB0935
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1256+SB0935

Bill Comments

feedback