VA SB935 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Group health benefit plans; bona fide associations. Replaces references to "bona fide association," as used in provisions applicable to health care plans in the small employer market, with the term "sponsoring association." The measure defines "sponsoring association" as a nonstock corporation that, among other conditions, has been actively in existence for 10 years, has at least five members, has been formed for purposes other than obtaining or providing health benefits, and operates as a nonprofit entity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Group health benefit plans; bona fide associations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18SenateCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB935ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House (51-Y 46-N)
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-01HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 9-N)
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB935S1
2018-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106108D-S1
2018-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-01SenateRead second time
2018-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106108D-S1
2018-01-29SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18104924D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823431(n/a)See Bill Text
3823432.1(n/a)See Bill Text
3823432.2(n/a)See Bill Text
3823432.3(n/a)See Bill Text
382508(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback