VA SB935 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Inpatient psychiatric hospital admission; defendant found incompetent. Removes the prohibition on inpatient psychiatric hospital admission for defendants who have already been ordered to receive treatment to restore their competency to stand trial. This bill incorporates SB 895 and is identical to HB 2462.
Title
Inpatient psychiatric hospital admission; defendant found incompetent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 605 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB935ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB935S1 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104304D-S1 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Incorporates SB895 (Marsden) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104304D-S1 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101069D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Criminal Procedure
Defendants
Health
Hospitals and Hospitalization
Criminal Procedure
Defendants
Health
Hospitals and Hospitalization